EARLSHEATON AS-SABEEL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Earlsheaton As-Sabeel Trust is a not for profit trust with aims and objectives to advance the religion of Islam in the area of Earlsheaton for the benefit of the public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kirklees
Governance
- 30 September 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Khurram Hussain | Trustee | 04 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Omar Farooq Mayet | Trustee | 04 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kamran Hussain | Trustee | 04 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Abdullah Dadibhai | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ismail Loonat | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ebrahim Mutvalli | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Danish Akhtar | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Farook Moosa | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £354.72k | £185.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.81k | £121.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 18 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 18 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 29 May 2024 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 29 May 2024 | 59 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 30 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION IN THE AREA OF EARLSHEATON FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A MASJID (PLACE OF WORSHIP), HOLDING OF LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON ISLAM TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE ISLAMIC FAITH BY ALL MEANS CONSISTENT WITH THE TEACHINGS OF THE QURAN AND AHAADITH AS INTERPRETED BY THE AHLE SUNNAH WAL JAMAAT, IN CONFORMITY WITH THE DEOBANDI SCHOOL OF THOUGHT AND THE TEACHINGS OF THE LATE HAZRAT MAULANA YUSUF MOTALA, FOUNDER OF DARUL ULOOM AL ARABIYYA AL ISLAMIYYAH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Masjid As-Salaam
4 New Street
Earlsheaton
DEWSBURY
West Yorkshire
WF12 8JJ
- Phone:
- 01924944327
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window