WHINNIES COMMUNITY GARDEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Whinnies Community Garden is situated in Sunniside, Gateshead, we are open to the public 1st April to 31st October, 12.30/4.30. Entry to the Garden is free and the garden is accessible to all including those with disabilities. We have a cafe where refreshments can be bought, along with freshly picked fruit, vegetables and flowers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gateshead
Governance
- 24 November 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carole Hindmarsh Holywell | Trustee | 18 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Paul Leslie Ryan | Trustee | 18 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Christine Cowans | Trustee | 19 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ronald Hart | Trustee | 19 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janice Fawcus | Trustee | 19 August 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 August 2023 | 18 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2023 | 18 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN A PUBLIC GARDEN FOR USE IN RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE INHABITANTS OF SUNNISIDE AND SURROUNDING COMMUNITY FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
29 CLOVER HILL
SUNNISIDE
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE16 5PT
- Phone:
- 07876678864
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window