Financial history SALE CENTRAL SCOUT GROUP

Charity Number: 520239
Charity reporting is up to date (173 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £43.12k £44.80k £53.61k £43.65k £37.42k
Total expenditure £39.96k £36.62k £33.01k £40.32k £54.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £22.66k £22.25k N/A N/A