ELLIE'S ANGELS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The preservation and protection of good mental health for the public benefit of those affected by poor mental health, particularly but not exclusively by the provision of online support services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 27 October 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicola Jones | Chair | 07 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Draper | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bethany Grace Foster | Trustee | 19 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Jane Ward | Trustee | 07 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Baker | Trustee | 07 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Scot Jones | Trustee | 07 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Michael Ward | Trustee | 07 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Louise Toms-Whittle | Trustee | 07 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 27 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD MENTAL HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THOSE AFFECTED BY POOR MENTAL HEALTH, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF ONLINE SUPPORT SERVICES
Contact information
- Address:
-
37 PREMIER WAY
KEMSLEY
SITTINGBOURNE
ME10 2GU
- Phone:
- 07817326965
- Email:
- info@elliesangels.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window