1ST/4TH REDDISH SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE GROUP EXISTS TO PROMOTE SCOUTING ACTIVITIES AS DESCRIBED IN SCOUTING LAW AS SET DOWN BY LORD BADEN POWELL, AND TO ENCOURAGE ITS GROWTH THROUGH THE RELEVANT AGE GROUPS OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE LOCAL AREA.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Stockport
Governance
- 30 October 1970: Standard registration
- 1ST REDDISH (METHODIST) SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniel Reeves | Trustee | 03 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Nicole Ryan Tollan | Trustee | 03 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Heather Payne | Trustee | 08 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Andrew Goodwin | Trustee | 26 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Roy Luscombe | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|||||
VINCENT PAUL CROLLA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.05k | £22.01k | £7.22k | £6.71k | £17.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.67k | £3.54k | £11.30k | £14.49k | £13.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.67k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 August 2023 | 188 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE DATED 4 JUNE 1970 UPON THE TRUST OF THE SCOUT TRUST DEED 1969
Charitable objects
SCOUT GROUP
Area of benefit
REDDISH
Contact information
- Address:
-
57 Tennyson Road
STOCKPORT
Cheshire
SK5 6JQ
- Phone:
- 07949051804
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window