CHRIST IDENTITY MINISTRIES (U.K.) INTERNATIONAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objectives of the company include the propagation of Christianity through: (a) Regular church services conducted by the senior pastor. (b) Biblical Studies (c) Theological Education (d) Evangelical Training (e) Christian Seminars and Symposium (f) Publication and distribution of Christian books and tapes (g) Charitable and Community Outreach Initiative
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 August 2022: CIO registration
- CIM UK INT'L (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Cyprian Ihediwa | Chair | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gregory Partick Udeh | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Godwin Onyekachi Egejuru | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev Gregory Patrick Udeh | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Goodness Adaeze Udochi Ohanusi | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Martins Ihediwa | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.77k | £1.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.26k | £3.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 February 2025 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 February 2025 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 May 2024 | 99 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 May 2024 | 99 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Aug 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN GRAVESEND, KENT AND OTHER PLACES WITHIN ENGLAND AND WALES, AND OVERSEAS, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENTS OF BELIEF APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE AND CHRISTIAN DOCTRINES, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Ladyacre Wynd
IRVINE
Ayrshire
Scotland
KA11 2FY
- Phone:
- 07714235089
- Email:
- cyprianihediwa@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window