1ST HEATON NORRIS SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing Beaver, Cubs and Scouts activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Stockport
Governance
- 17 September 1963: Standard registration
- 1ST HEATON NORRIS BOY SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julie Anne Sutcliffe | Chair | 14 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
David William Lowe | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
CHRIS BUTCHER | Trustee | 26 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
HELEN BERRY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.64k | £24.15k | £13.12k | £16.51k | £13.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.03k | £17.71k | £19.12k | £17.10k | £22.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.67k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 March 2024 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 February 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 1ST OCTOBER 1954 UPON THE TRUSTS OF THE BOY SCOUTS ASSOCIATION TRUST DEED 1935.
Charitable objects
PURPOSES OF THE 1ST HEATON NORRIS SCOUT GROUP AS LAID OUT IN THE POLICY, ORGANISATION AND RULES OF THE SCOUT ASSOCIATION
Area of benefit
HEATON NORRIS
Contact information
- Address:
-
96 Crescent Park
STOCKPORT
Cheshire
SK4 2JE
- Phone:
- 01614427012
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window