BLUE BEAR FREEDOM (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Blue Bear Freedom UK's charitable purposes include giving grants to projects and organisations supporting children and young people affected by modern slavery, human trafficking and exploitation. Blue Bear Freedom UK also raises awareness through a variety of means, including social media, written publications, podcasts and speaking engagements.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Dominican Republic
Governance
- 19 August 2022: CIO registration
- 23 January 2024: Funds received from 1191986 BRAVE BEAR TRUST
- BBF UK (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bryn Frere-Smith | Chair | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Heather Lewis | Trustee | 17 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Pascall | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rosie Gillum | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Frere-Smith | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Anne Brighouse | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anna Dean | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Aug 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN AND SUCH OTHER PERSONS WHO ARE (OR AT RISK OF BEING) THE VICTIM OF HUMAN TRAFFICKING AND SEXUAL EXPLOITATION IN THE DOMINICAN REPUBLIC AND SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AND TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF THE VICTIMS PRIMARILY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL SUPPORT TO VICTIMS AND RAISING AWARENESS OF HUMAN TRAFFICKING IN PARTICULAR THE CONSEQUENCES FOR VICTIMS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Blue Bear Coffee Co
13 Tombland
NORWICH
NR3 1HF
- Phone:
- 01603 652097
- Email:
- Bryn@bluebearfreedom.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window