WEST MERSEA FREE CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our charity is a local Baptist Church. We hold regular Sunday services to which all are welcome, and also other activities during the week, for the benefit of members and the local community. We offer pastoral care and want to share the good news of Jesus with those in the area of Mersea Island, which is south of Colchester, Essex.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 03 May 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Magrie-Cogram | Trustee | 21 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Hills | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Heather Ann Farthing | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Ann Tucker | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Colin Paul Tucker | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Christopher Jones B.ED | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Edward Hills | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Denise Caldwell BA Hons | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Frances Board BSc Hons | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £76.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £84.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 03 May 2023
Charitable objects
THE PRINCIPAL PURPOSES OF THE CHURCH ARE:- 3.1.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE BAPTIST DENOMINATION. 3.1.2 THE CHURCH MAY ALSO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WEST MERSEA FREE CHURCH
32 MILL ROAD
WEST MERSEA
COLCHESTER
CO5 8RJ
- Phone:
- 01206735940
- Email:
- secretary@merseafree.church
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window