DARWEN MASTERS SWIMMING CLUB

Charity number: 1200203
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The promotion of community participation in healthy recreation, primarily but not exclusively, for the benefit of the inhabitants of Darwen, Blackburn and the surrounding areas by the provision of facilities for swimming and associated activities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024

Total income: £11,501
Total expenditure: £12,920

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Blackburn With Darwen

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 August 2022: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Holland Chair 13 January 2024
None on record
Dr Alison Armour Trustee 11 November 2024
None on record
Elizabeth Margaret Lord Trustee 11 November 2024
None on record
Keith Eagle Trustee 13 January 2024
None on record
Harry Hayden Trustee 13 January 2024
None on record
Craig Blackburn Trustee 13 January 2024
None on record
Lee Blackburn Trustee 13 January 2024
None on record
Tracey Yates Trustee 13 January 2024
None on record
Kevin Massey Trustee 23 July 2022
MY LIFE LEGACY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £9.19k £11.50k
Total expenditure £9.28k £12.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 09 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 09 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2023 17 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 17 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
41 Sandringham Drive
Brinscall
CHORLEY
Lancashire
PR6 8SU
Phone:
07747601920
Website:

darwenmsc.com