AHEAD OF THE GAME FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides free cancer pre/rehabilitation for those diagnosed with cancer and vital support for their families. Specialist coaches provide tailored physical, mental, and emotional care, including physical training, pilates, yoga, mindfulness and workshops. Individuals are sign posted to other organisations when deemed appropriate such as mental health counselling and/or nutritional support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
13 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 November 2022: CIO registration
- A HEAD IN THE GAME CIC (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Michael Bolton | Chair | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kelsey Parker | Trustee | 13 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
DOMINIC MATTEO | Trustee | 06 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Steven McGauley | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £289.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £209.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 27 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF THOSE WITH A CONFIRMED DIAGNOSIS OF CANCER AND/OR A LONG-TERM HEALTH CONDITION CAUSED BY CANCER AND ITS LONG-TERM EFFECTS AND THEIR FAMILIES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THROUGH: A) A CANCER PRE/REHABILITATION PROGRAMME PROVIDED BY FULLY QUALIFIED SPECIALIST COACHES; B) EDUCATIONAL WORKSHOPS ON RELATED TOPICS AND EFFECTS OF CANCER; C) SIGNPOSTING INDIVIDUALS TO OTHER ORGANISATION’S WHEN APPROPRIATE SUCH AS MENTAL HEALTH COUNSELLING, AND/OR SPECIALIST NUTRITIONIST ADVICE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 Dudley Road
New Brighton
Wirral
Ch45 9JP
- Phone:
- 01512945953
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window