FRIENDS OF ERLESTOKE PRISON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Working in partnership with the prison management team, the organisation provides initiatives which are proven to support offenders with the challenges of resettlement and rehabilitation. With these initiatives we help offenders face up to the impact of their crimes and help them develop skills and behaviours which will make them better able to find employment when they leave prison.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 19 December 2022: CIO registration
- 07 August 2023: Funds received from 1147582 FRIENDS OF ERLESTOKE PRISON
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Primrose Campbell | Chair | 19 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Angela Fay Hughes BSc | Trustee | 19 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark MANGHAM | Trustee | 19 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charles Atterton | Trustee | 19 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr EVE MCBRIDE | Trustee | 19 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Susan Weber | Trustee | 19 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Nicholas Anthony Crean | Trustee | 19 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Lady Sarah Gooch | Trustee | 19 December 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £291.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND SUPPORT THE REHABILITATION OF PRISONERS WHO ARE OR HAVE PREVIOUSLY BEEN PRISONERS AT HMP ERLESTOKE, BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS AND SERVICES AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT AND IN CONSULTATION WITH THE PRISON GOVERNORS/GOVERNING BODY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
H M Prison
Westbury Road
Erlestoke
Devizes
Wiltshire
SN10 5TU
- Phone:
- 01380814250
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window