TALKS WITH M.S.

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a big brother big sister platform that creates safe spaces for those living with Multiple Sclerosis and their allies. We do this by: * Webinars * Peer support groups * In-person events * Educational sessions * Advocacy training * Lived Experience focus groups
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 January 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
- 13 January 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Terri-louise Brown | Chair | 13 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
SABTISHA GORDON | Trustee | 13 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
JOSEPH BROWN | Trustee | 13 January 2023 |
|
|||||
yolande Brown | Trustee | 13 January 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 January 2024 | 26 March 2025 | 116 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 January 2024 | 16 April 2025 | 137 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Jan 2023
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE DIAGNOSED WITH OR AFFECTED BY MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS, THEIR CARERS AND FRIENDS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: PROVIDING TALKS AND WEBINARS TO INCREASE KNOWLEDGE OF MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS, AND PROVIDE ADVICE AND SUPPORT ESTABLISHING AND OPERATING PEER-LED SUPPORT GROUPS TO DISCUSS AND SHARE EXPERIENCE OF SYMPTOMS, TREATMENT AND LIVING WITH THE DISEASE RAISING AWARENESS AND SUPPORTING OPPORTUNITIES FOR PARTICIPATION IN MEDICAL RESEARCH INTO THE DISEASE
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 JOSLYN CLOSE
ENFIELD
EN3 6GE
- Phone:
- 01992766531
- Email:
- info@talkswithms.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window