UKUTOGETHER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
UKUTogether are committed and active in settling the most vulnerable refugees in the UK and ensuring they are thriving with almost zero cost to society. We support initiatives including cultural, educational and rebuilding lives following life changing events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 24 February 2023: CIO registration
- UKUAT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Hay ACA | Trustee | 23 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Irene Molodtsov | Trustee | 23 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Molodtsov | Trustee | 23 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rory Colfer FCA | Trustee | 23 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Michael McGuigan | Trustee | 23 June 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Feb 2023
Charitable objects
THE CIO’S OBJECTS (‘OBJECTS’) ARE: • TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONGST THOSE SEEKING ASYLUM AND THOSE GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS PARTICULARLY BY THE PROVISION OF LEGAL AND OTHER ADVICE. • THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONGST THOSE GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM RELATING TO THE WAR IN UKRAINE AND THEIR DEPENDANTS. • TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF THOSE GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS AND THEIR DEPENDANTS. • TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THOSE GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS AND THEIR DEPENDANTS IN NEED THEREOF TO ADVANCE THEM IN LIFE AND ASSIST THEM TO ADAPT WITHIN A NEW COMMUNITY. • TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL ABOUT THE ISSUES RELATING TO REFUGEES AND THOSE SEEKING ASYLUM. • THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THOSE PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES. • THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONGST THOSE SEEKING ASYLUM IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR WHO ARE REFUGEES. • THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT OF THOSE GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS AND THOSE SEEKING ASYLUM IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, AND IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF VOCATIONAL AND SKILLS TRAINING, ADVICE AND SUPPORT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WINDRUSH MANOR
WINDRUSH
BURFORD
OX18 4TU
- Phone:
- 07990530747
- Email:
- info@ukuatogether.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window