UKRAINE TO CHILTERNS CHARITABLE INCORPORATED ORGANISATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides support and information for both Ukrainian refugees and their host families by way of meetings and online information. Activities are facilitated to ensure Ukrainians can settle in the UK such as English lessons and the opportunities for English conversation. Ukrainians are assisted to establish their own means of providing for their families through work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 31 August 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Louisa Hamilton Spearing | Chair | 31 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Susan Claire Hughes | Trustee | 20 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nataliia Zagrebelna | Trustee | 20 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Olena Boboshko-Harbuz | Trustee | 02 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marie-Louise Morley | Trustee | 03 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Elizabeth Collet-Fenson | Trustee | 31 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Juliet Gresham Thomas-Davies | Trustee | 31 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Gulliver | Trustee | 31 August 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.03k | £16.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.08k | £11.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £877 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 31 Aug 2022
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF UKRAINIANS GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS UNDER THE HOMES FOR UKRAINE SCHEME AND THEIR HOSTS IN PRINCES RISBOROUGH, LOOSLEY ROW, LACEY GREEN, SPEEN AND OTHER NEARBY VILLAGES IN THE SOUTH BUCKINGHAMSHIRE CHILTERNS AREA, BY THE PROVISION OF PRACTICAL AND FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, ADVICE AND SUPPORT. THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THOSE PERSONS WHO ARE UKRAINIAN REFUGEES IN THIS COUNTRY UNDER THE HOMES FOR UKRAINE SCHEME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
GREEN PASTURES
LOWER ROAD
LOOSLEY ROW
PRINCES RISBOROUGH
HP27 0PF
- Phone:
- 07979363316
- Email:
- louisa.spearing@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
ukraine2chilterns.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window