Financial history BRIGHAM WAR MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 520294
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £10.61k £16.12k £23.01k £12.01k £30.25k
Total expenditure £7.52k £11.84k £9.82k £13.39k £29.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £11.33k £17.30k £2.67k N/A