PHGS FOUNDATION LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advance of Orthodox Jewish religion and advanced education by the provision of a day school for boys known as Pardes House Grammar School and by ancillary or incidental educational or religious activities and other associated activities for the benefit of the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 28 November 2022: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RABBI YEHUDAH HALPERN | Chair | 08 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £209.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £159.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 17 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 17 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08 JAN 2021
Charitable objects
THE ONLY OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE THE ORTHODOX JEWISH RELIGION AND ADVANCE EDUCATION BY THE PROVISION OF A DAY SCHOOL FOR BOYS KNOWN AS PARDES HOUSE GRAMMAR SCHOOL AND BY ANCILLARY OR INCIDENTAL EDUCATIONAL OR RELIGIOUS ACTIVITIES AND OTHER ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
PARDES HOUSE GRAMMAR SCHOOL
HENDON LANE
LONDON
N3 1SA
- Phone:
- 07792464513
- Email:
- ACCOUNTS@PARDESGRAMMAR.CO.UK
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window