LONDON HISTORICAL FENCING CLUB

Charity Number: 1200898
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The promotion of community participation in healthy recreation and in particular by the promotion of Historical European Martial Arts by providing training, scholarships, competitions and tournaments and in other such ways as the trustees think appropriate.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Services
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 November 2022: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Daniel Weir Chair 03 November 2022
None on record
James Tamplin Trustee 14 September 2024
LONDON HISTORICAL FENCING CLUB
Received: On time
Rebecca McBain Trustee 14 September 2024
None on record

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2023
Total gross income £0
Total expenditure £0
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 02 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 03 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
London Historical Fencing Club
Arch 12, Miles Street
London
SW8 2TG
Phone:
07964811533
Website:

londonhistoricalfencing.club