DORKING CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious Activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 September 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Euler Fronda | Chair | 31 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Marquises | Trustee | 04 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nancy Del Valle | Trustee | 31 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sir Antonio Espiritu | Trustee | 31 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Norilyn Abad | Trustee | 31 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Miracle Joy Gelacio | Trustee | 31 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Virginia Baloaloa | Trustee | 31 July 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION IN DORKING AND THE SURROUNDING AREA FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT MAINLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON CHRISTIANITY TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE CHRISTIANITY, AND TO PROVIDE PASTORAL CARE FOR THE LOCAL COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
92 HOMEFIELD PARK
SUTTON
SM1 2DY
- Phone:
- 07465951005
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window