THE WILDERNESS PROGRAMME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TWP is a residential, non-medical mental health recovery programme specifically designed for adult individuals over the age of 21 years to meet the needs of those coming to terms with, or in recovery of issues such as addictions, professional burn out, stress, anxiety, depression, PTSD and other mental health related problems. We operate primarily in The Lake District National Park.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 September 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IAN MITCHELL | Chair | 30 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Ridehalgh | Trustee | 30 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Nansen Slack | Trustee | 30 January 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 26 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 26 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Sep 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROTECT AND PROMOTE GOOD MENTAL HEALTH RECOVERY AMONG PEOPLE WHO ARE EXPERIENCING AND OR RECOVERING FROM MENTAL HEALTH CONDITIONS, OR THOSE WHO ARE AT RISK OF DEVELOPING MENTAL HEALTH CONDITIONS, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ‘WILDERNESS THERAPY’ IN A FACILITY WHICH PROVIDES COUNSELLING, PSYCHOTHERAPY AND PEER TO PEER SUPPORT IN THE FORM OF RECOVERY COACHING PSYCHOLOGY, ALSO TO INCLUDE ACTIVITIES WHICH ARE DESIGNED TO PROMOTE GOOD MENTAL HEALTH AND RECOVERY OF THOSE IMPACTED BY MENTAL HEALTH CONDITIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Robinson Udale
Unit 1
41 King Street
PENRITH
Cumbria
CA11 7AY
- Phone:
- 07971027182
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window