THE SIEBERT CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General Charitable Purposes. Trust is open to applications. Please submit your application to https://funding.ludlowtrust.com
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 12 July 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 July 2022: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Alun Siebert | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||
Ludlow Trust Company Ltd | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||
Catherine Frances Siebert | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 12/07/2023 | 12/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.70k | £4.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.84k | £14.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 12 July 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 12 July 2023 | 20 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 July 2023 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12 JUL 2022
Charitable objects
AS PER OBJECTS IN DEED ? STANDARD OBJECTS ARE : THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE INCOME, AND ALL OR SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL, AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER TO, OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH CHARITIES OR SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD (OBJECTS) AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ludlow Trust Company Limited
First Floor
Tower Wharf
Cheese Lane
Bristol
BS2 0JJ
- Phone:
- +441173138200
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window