THE SHEFFIELD RETIRED GREYHOUNDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Sheffield Retired Greyhounds organisation operates to take in ex racing greyhounds from the Sheffield area, as we have limited kennel spaces available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 28 July 2023: Standard registration
- 03 March 2025: Funds received from 517441 SOUTH YORKSHIRE ANIMAL RESCUE
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew Hamilton | Chair | 18 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helena Wrigglesworth | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Hodson | Trustee | 18 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £172.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £146.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 31 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 31 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18 OCT 2022
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SUFFERING AND DISTRESS OF GREYHOUNDS RETIRED FROM RACING, INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE FOLLOWING: A) PROVIDING VETERINARY ATTENTION AND TREATMENT FOR THOSE GREYHOUNDS WHO REQUIRE IT; B) PROVIDING SANCTUARY FOR RETIRED OR UNWANTED GREYHOUNDS, INCLUDING THOSE WITH MEDICAL OR BEHAVIOURAL ISSUES; C) ARRANGING CAREFUL AND RESPONSIBLE RE-HOMING OF GREYHOUNDS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rotherham Gate Lodge
Howbrook Lane
Wortley
Sheffield
S35 7EH
- Phone:
- 01142888300
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window