TURKISH ANGLICAN CHURCH NETWORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Weekly services, prayer meetings, bible study, discipleship and fellowship groups, children's ministry, english lessons, social activities on Turkish holidays, seminars on business, family issues and other subjects of interest to our church and wider community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £10,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 16 November 2022: CIO registration
- LONDRA DIRILIş KILISESI (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Suna Gurkan | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ali Celep | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Engin YILDIRIM | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gulfer Gokcek | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charles Royland de Bueger | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION) BY PROVIDING WORSHIP, PRAYER AND CHRISTIAN TEACHING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Michael At Bowes Church
Palmerston Road
LONDON
N22 8QX
- Phone:
- 07908335400
- Email:
- info@londradirilis.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window