CASPA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide social activities for autistic individuals and their families. We provide support for parents and carers
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bexley
- Bromley
- Croydon
- Greenwich
- Kent
- Lewisham
- Surrey
Governance
- 21 October 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Hunt | Chair | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Cleverly | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Helen Smith | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Harrison | Trustee | 21 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Simon Boyle | Trustee | 21 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
TO SUPPORT THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN AND ADULTS, INCLUDING THEIR PARENTS, CARERS AND FAMILIES, WHO ARE AUTISTIC AND/OR NEURODIVERGENT, IN LONDON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THEIR QUALITY OF LIFE, PROMOTE THEIR INCLUSION IN THEIR LOCAL COMMUNITIES AND TO HELP AND SUPPORT THEM TO REACH THEIR FULL POTENTIAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CASPA
COMMUNITY HOUSE
SOUTH STREET
BROMLEY
BR1 1RH
- Phone:
- 07940168701
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window