HAYYA ALAL FALAH WELFARE FOUNDATION UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hayya Alal Falah aims to work towards prevention or relief of poverty in the UK and Pakistan by providing grants, items and services to individuals in need and/or charities, or other organisations working to prevent or relieve poverty. We also engage with communities to provide Safe Drinking Water to underprivileged areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 12 July 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Luton
- Slough
- Throughout London
- Pakistan
Governance
- 10 August 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Muhammad Arshad Faridi | Chair | 10 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Noshina Arshad | Trustee | 10 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Qamar Farooq | Trustee | 10 August 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 12/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 12 July 2023 | 24 August 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 July 2023 | 24 August 2024 | 104 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Aug 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN THE UK AND PAKISTAN BY PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
102 LONG FURLONG DRIVE
SLOUGH
SL2 2PG
- Phone:
- 07737391920
- Email:
- docfaridi@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window