GLASSONBY VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Glassonby Village Hall is responsible for managing a parcel of land that was gifted to the Parish. The property was gifted for "the purposes of a village hall for the use of the inhabitants of the Parish of Glassonby residing within a radius of one mile". The present aim is to rejuvenate the plot into a new community focal point that serves the present day needs and wishes of the inhabitants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £7,500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cumbria
Governance
- 18 August 1964: Standard registration
- Glassonby Community Hub (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James O'Neill | Chair | 14 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Dyer | Trustee | 14 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Wicks | Trustee | 14 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Claire Ousby | Trustee | 14 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sara Braithwaite | Trustee | 14 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Walmesley | Trustee | 14 February 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £12.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £1.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £7.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 04 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 18 October 2021 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 18 October 2021 | 413 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF GIFT DATED 1ST NOVEMBER 1963. as amended on 31 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
PARISH OF GLASSONBY (RADIUS OF 1 MILE FROM VILLAGE HALL).
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rose Bank
Glassonby
PENRITH
Cumbria
CA10 1DU
- Phone:
- 01768870004
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window