FRIENDS OF WINDSOR MUSIC (WINDSOR LEARNING PARTNERSHIP)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising for the advancement of education and the advancement of the arts for the public benefit in particular by promoting the study and performance of music and the performing arts by children attending the schools of the Windsor Learning Partnership, Berkshire UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Windsor And Maidenhead
Governance
- 14 July 2022: CIO registration
- FRIENDS OF WINDSOR MUSIC (WLP) (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brian Mather | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
JAMES MANWARING | Trustee | 04 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Gaskell | Trustee | 04 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Lawrence | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angela Jane Haymonds | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sylwia Joanna Peczak | Trustee | 28 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Jane Higton | Trustee | 28 February 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 18 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 18 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 14 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ARTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BY PROMOTING THE STUDY AND PERFORMANCE OF MUSIC AND THE PERFORMING ARTS BY CHILDREN ATTENDING THE SCHOOLS OF THE WINDSOR LEARNING PARTNERSHIP.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WINDSOR LEARNING PARTNERSHIP
WINDSOR GIRLS SCHOOL
IMPERIAL ROAD
WINDSOR
BERKSHIRE
SL4 3RT
- Phone:
- 01753795155
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window