Trustees FRIENDS OF WINDSOR MUSIC (WINDSOR LEARNING PARTNERSHIP)

Charity number: 1199657
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Brian Mather Trustee 18 March 2024
None on record
JAMES MANWARING Trustee 04 March 2024
None on record
Kathryn Gaskell Trustee 04 March 2024
None on record
Katherine Lawrence Trustee 20 April 2023
None on record
Angela Jane Haymonds Trustee 28 September 2022
None on record
Sylwia Joanna Peczak Trustee 28 February 2022
None on record
Victoria Jane Higton Trustee 28 February 2022
None on record