Trustees LACY THOMPSON MEMORIAL HALL
Charity Number: 520319

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN CHARLES BRAY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Richard Tipping | Trustee | 27 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Shaw | Trustee | 03 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ella Hage | Trustee | 03 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carole Christie | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Barron | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Barron | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Halliday | Trustee | 04 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anne Halliday | Trustee | 04 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lea-Anne Potter | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Potter | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.