Accounts and annual returns THE HIGH HARRINGTON COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 520320
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 29 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 29 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 01 March 2024 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 August 2022 211 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required