THE HIGH HARRINGTON COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing social and educational activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £1,530 from 2 government contract(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cumbria
Governance
- 10 January 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Judith Ann Frazer | Chair | 19 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Jane Rogers | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ronald Foster | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
William Laird | Trustee | 26 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Jones | Trustee | 26 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Celean Messenger | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.09k | £300 | £1.00k | £4.59k | £58.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.17k | £1.20k | £2.43k | £2.56k | £38.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.53k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 March 2024 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 August 2022 | 211 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 31ST MAY 1950
Charitable objects
PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
PARISH OF HARRINGTON AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Crooklands
High Harrington
WORKINGTON
Cumbria
CA14 4NJ
- Phone:
- 01946830330
- Email:
- thegreenhut110@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window