Financial history FITZ PARK

Charity number: 520327
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £194.99k £187.11k £230.70k £257.77k £278.57k
Total expenditure £175.93k £178.40k £206.87k £214.67k £315.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £140.75k N/A N/A N/A N/A