Keswick Youth Center Services

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Running a Youth Club for the young people of Keswick
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cumbria
Governance
- 09 June 1967: Standard registration
- KESWICK YOUTH CENTRE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
phillip roberts | Chair | 01 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Gary Lovatt | Trustee | 12 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Susan Patricia Starkey | Trustee | 05 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Moran | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Carol Graham | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sue McLoughlin Booth | Trustee | 21 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jorrit Jorritsma | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|||||
GARETH MENDUS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.76k | £4.38k | £4.68k | £27.38k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.50k | £10.50k | £3.50k | £20.94k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £26.65k | N/A | N/A | £10.86k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 08 September 2024 | 100 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 06 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 06 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 22 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 22 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 22 January 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1963 AS AMENDED 1967 AS AMENDED 20 MAY 1980 AS AMENDED 25 SEPTEMBER 1984 as amended on 19 Mar 2019 as amended on 19 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
HELPING AND EDUCATING YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH THEIR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES SO THE DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED.
Area of benefit
KESWICK
Contact information
- Address:
-
Thistle Dome House
Low Scales
Aspatria
Scales
WIGTON
CA7 3NE
- Phone:
- 07730284529
- Email:
- phill.roberts@keswickycs.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window