HYDROGENUNITED.ORG

Charity Number: 1201802
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The promotion of environmental protection and improvement for the public benefit by educating the public in green hydrogen, its properties and applications through public events and the operation of a website

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £20,000
Total expenditure: £9,344

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Birmingham City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 February 2023: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Kevin Kendall FRS Chair 01 February 2023
None on record
Patricia Jennifer Kendall Trustee 01 February 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £24.00k £20.00k
Total expenditure £24.00k £9.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 21 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 21 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 19 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 19 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Flat 8 Birnam
56 Harborne Road
BIRMINGHAM
B15 3HE
Phone:
07903757389
Website:

HydrogenUnited.org