UKRAINIAN ACTION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Ukrainian Action (UA) is a volunteer-run non-profit dedicated to supporting the survival and recovery of Ukraine.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
- Poland
- Ukraine
Governance
- 01 March 2023: CIO registration
- UA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jeffrey Hartman | Chair | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip Gardner | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Morgan | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Natalia Hartman | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £68.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 01 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: (A) THE RELIEF AND PREVENTION OF POVERTY IN UKRAINE AND ELSEWHERE AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT; (B) THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND SAVING OF LIVES IN UKRAINE AND ELSEWHERE AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT; AND (C) THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF PEOPLE WHO ARE THE VICTIMS OF WAR, HUMAN RIGHTS VIOLATIONS, NATURAL DISASTER, TROUBLE OR CATASTROPHE IN UKRAINE AND ELSEWHERE AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT; PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (I) PROVIDING PHYSICAL, FINANCIAL, MEDICAL AND OTHER RESOURCES; (II) CARRYING OUT REDEVELOPMENT PROJECTS AND PROVIDING INFRASTRUCTURE AND UTILITIES; AND (III) ASSISTING REFUGEES WITH RESETTLEMENT, AND SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
167-169 Great Portland street
5th Floor
London
W1W 5PF
- Phone:
- 07554426881
- Email:
- info@ukrainianaction.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window