CHABAD LUBAVITCH OF TRAFFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing Jewish educational, cultural and social programming for both youth and adults, as well as provision of basic religious articles and grants for needy people to help with extra costs which they could not otherwise afford.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 22 September 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Trafford
Governance
- 23 September 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GARY GLICKMAN | Trustee | 23 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Rabbi Dovid Lewis | Trustee | 23 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rabbi Eliezer Simon | Trustee | 23 September 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 22/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 22 September 2023 | 22 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 22 September 2023 | 22 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
1) THE ADVANCEMENT AND PROMOTION OF THE ORTHODOX JEWISH FAITH WITHIN THE TRAFFORD METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF GREATER MANCHESTER, THROUGH PASTORAL CARE, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATION AND/OR DISTRIBUTION OF ITEMS RELATED TO RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, AND PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE ORTHODOX JEWISH FAITH BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE STUDY OF AND INSTRUCTIONS IN JEWISH RELIGIOUS TEXTS, TEACHINGS, CUSTOMS AND PRACTICES OF THE ORTHODOX JEWISH FAITH; AND (2) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ITEMS, FINANCIAL AND PRACTICAL ASSISTANCE TO PERSONS OF THE JEWISH FAITH LOCATED WITHIN THE TRAFFORD METROPOLITAN BOROUGH WHICH THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD THROUGH LACK OF MEANS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Barns Place
Hale Barns
Altrincham
WA15 0HP
- Phone:
- 07935895600
- Email:
- RabbiMChein@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window