PENRITH EVERGREEN CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Penrith Evergreen is a community building, which can be hired for a various activities, including personal parties. Currently several organisations hire our building for dance, zumba, tai boxing, salsa, moky, indoor bowling, senior citizens club, childrens holiday club, flower club, organ club, pipers club.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Total income includes £8,927 from 3 government grant(s)
People

2 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cumbria
Governance
- 24 October 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IRIS CAVEN | Trustee | 11 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
LILLY ANN TINKLER | Trustee | 08 January 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.65k | £22.81k | £22.16k | £27.75k | £28.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.09k | £17.30k | £18.56k | £25.79k | £22.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £23.98k | £8.93k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 113 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 113 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 479 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 479 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2022
(These accounts |
11 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 March 2022 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 March 2022 | 38 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 12TH OCTOBER, 1961
Charitable objects
RECREATION HALL FOR INHABITANTS OF PENSIONABLE AGE
Area of benefit
PENRITH
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Burney Beck Cottages
Great Asby
Appleby-in-Westmorland
CA16 6HG
- Phone:
- 01768352672
- Email:
- evergreenhall1944@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window