THE DORCHESTER KEEP MILITARY MUSEUM TRUST

Charity Number: 1200607
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Charity governs The Keep Military Museum in Dorchester, in succession to The Devon and Dorset Military Museums Charity (1054956)

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £116,843
Total expenditure: £117,442

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Bournemouth
  • Devon
  • Dorset
  • Plymouth City
  • Poole
  • Torbay

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 October 2022: CIO registration
  • 15 December 2023: Funds received from 1054956 THE DEVON AND DORSET MILITARY MUSEUMS CHARITY
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Brigadier RICHARD H D TOOMEY CBE DL Chair 07 October 2022
Action4Diabetes
Received: On time
THE DEVONSHIRE AND DORSET REGIMENTAL TRUST
Received: On time
Martin Fausset TD Trustee 01 January 2024
None on record
Simon Davies Trustee 01 January 2024
None on record
Philip Ashley Cooper Trustee 13 January 2023
None on record
Colonel DAVID JAMES LORD SWANN CBE DL Trustee 13 January 2023
THE ROYAL ARMOURED CORPS MEMORIAL TRUST
Received: On time
Michael Worthy Kinney Trustee 13 January 2023
None on record
David Francis Herbert Jones Trustee 07 October 2022
None on record
VICTORIA JANE DE WIT Trustee 07 October 2022
None on record
JEREMY MICHAEL ARCHER MA Trustee 07 October 2022
THE DEVONSHIRE AND DORSET REGIMENTAL TRUST
Received: On time
ROYAL COMMONWEALTH EX-SERVICES LEAGUE
Received: On time
THE RIFLES OFFICERS' FUND
Received: 7 days late
THE RIFLES REGIMENTAL TRUST
Received: 7 days late
THE RIFLES BENEVOLENT TRUST
Received: 7 days late
THE NOT FORGOTTEN ASSOCIATION (NFA)
Received: On time
Colin Albert Parr MBE Trustee 07 October 2022
THE DORSET YEOMANRY REGIMENTAL ASSOCIATION
Charity reporting is overdue by 848 days
THE QUEEN'S OWN DORSET YEOMANRY AND DORSET GARRISON CHARITY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2023
Total gross income £116.84k
Total expenditure £117.44k
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 24 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 24 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Keep Military Museum
The Keep
Barrack Road
DORCHESTER
DT1 1RN
Phone:
01305264066