RISE UP LONDON

Charity Number: 1199969
Charity reporting is overdue by 114 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Rise Up London is a community-based organization that empowers undeserved populations through education and skills development programs. We operate in the greater London area and provide accessible, inclusive, and high-quality services to individuals and groups from diverse backgrounds.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Hackney
  • Haringey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 August 2022: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
yakov rothschild Chair 28 July 2022
None on record
Devorah Geldzhaler Meisels Trustee 28 July 2022
None on record
Malka Schweitzer Trustee 28 July 2022
None on record

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2023
Total gross income £0
Total expenditure £0
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 114 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 114 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
20 LEABOURNE ROAD
LONDON
N16 6TA
Phone:
07469617415
Website:

No information available