HARTLEY RECREATION GROUND

Charity Number: 520364
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To maintain the field and its recreation facilities for the residents of Scotby

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £8,597
Total expenditure: £8,277

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Cumbria

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 May 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • HARTLEY TRUST RECREATION GROUND (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Claire Jones Trustee 21 January 2025
None on record
Robert Geoffrey Mitchell Trustee 30 June 2022
THE SCOTBY VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
Brian Routledge Trustee 15 April 2021
None on record
Joanne Routledge Trustee 18 February 2021
THE SCOTBY VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
Phil Pattinson Trustee 03 December 2020
None on record
Martin Purdie Trustee 20 June 2018
None on record
John Raffles Trustee 16 June 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £4.89k £16.47k £8.94k £19.31k £8.60k
Total expenditure £2.14k £19.89k £4.70k £12.23k £8.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £1.45k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 27 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 09 April 2024 64 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 23 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 15 March 2022 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 26 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
3 Waller Street
CARLISLE
CA1 2DA
Phone:
07584486589
Website:

no.web.site