POLLINATING LONDON TOGETHER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pollinating London Together will directly help to redress the decline in pollinators in urban environments through its educational resources, public events series, educating schools, promoting citizen science, developing and carrying out audits of green spaces and encouraging pollinator-friendly planting in the City of London, its immediate environs and then to the rest of the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
- 31 January 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Richard Burton | Chair | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Sillett | Trustee | 31 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Paolo Cuomo | Trustee | 30 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mark Huxley | Trustee | 08 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Julie Griffiths | Trustee | 12 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Sales | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Virginia Bond | Trustee | 14 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Emmins | Trustee | 02 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Stephen Sidney Charles Smith | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Anthony Bickmore | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Heather Anne Barrett-Mold | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £205.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £182.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 31 Jan 2023 as amended on 16 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO: 3.1 ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN BIODIVERSITY AND THE IMPORTANCE ALL POLLINATING INSECTS IN THE ENVIRONMENT, AND IN PARTICULAR, TO: 3.1.1 RAISE AWARENESS OF ALL POLLINATORS, THE CHALLENGES FACING THEM AND WHAT CAN BE DONE TO REVERSE THEIR DECLINE; 3.1.2 PROMOTE THE NEEDS OF POLLINATING INSECTS THROUGH MEDIA APPEARANCES, PUBLIC OUTREACH AND COLLABORATIONS WITH UNIVERSITIES, LOCAL COUNCILS, OTHER ORGANISATIONS AND ACADEMICS; AND 3.1.3 STIMULATE KNOWLEDGE AND RESEARCH IN THE FIELD OF POLLINATING INSECTS IN THE ENVIRONMENT THROUGH COLLABORATING WITH CHARITIES, UNIVERSITIES, LOCAL COUNCILS AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS AND THE DISSEMINATION OF RESEARCH RESULTS; 3.2 PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION, AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT IN LONDON INITIALLY, AND THEN THE UNITED KINGDOM, WITH THE PARTICULAR AIM OF: 3.2.1 ADVANCING BIODIVERSITY IN NEGLECTED GREEN SPACES; 3.2.2 CREATING AND PROMOTING BIO-DIVERSE HABITATS FOR BEES AND OTHER POLLINATING INSECTS; 3.2.3 DEVELOPING AND DELIVERING POLLINATOR FORAGE-PLANTING PROJECTS. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WINCKWORTH SHERWOOD LLP
2 CHAWLEY PARK
CUMNOR HILL
OXFORD
OX2 9GG
- Phone:
- 07770233000
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window