MAKE A CHANGE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the public benefit, the prevention or relief of poverty in India and Kenya by the provision of food, clothing and any other essential items and services required to meet the basic standard of living.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- India
- Kenya
Governance
- 06 March 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kiran Devraj Patel | Chair | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rajesh Hirji Halai | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dipesh Kanji Kerai | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ramji Kurji Dubasiya | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sachin Naran Patel | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mahesh Lalji Patel | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ratilal Karsan Bhudia | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dinesh Dhanji Vekaria | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £108.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £68.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN INDIA AND KENYA BY THE PROVISION OF FOOD, CLOTHING AND ANY OTHER ESSENTIAL ITEMS AND SERVICES REQUIRED TO MEET THE BASIC STANDARD OF LIVING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
111 ELMSLEIGH AVENUE
HARROW
HA3 8HY
- Phone:
- 07782102472
- Email:
- INFO@MACFOUNDATION.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window