IGNITE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our current project is focused on providing children living in Edmonton with free access to a boxing gym. Daily sessions with a professional coach to build on their technique and fitness. Through sport we will build on the youths confidence, give them guidance and encourage self belief. Our main aim is to tackle knife crime by providing facilities that give them a focus and aspiration.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 04 May 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Enfield
Governance
- 14 July 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tony Medall | Chair | 14 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Danielle Claire Rainert | Trustee | 14 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Green | Trustee | 14 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Jennings | Trustee | 14 July 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 May 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 May 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 Jul 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, AND IN PARTICULAR PARTICIPATION IN THE SPORT OF AMATEUR BOXING, OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SECOND FLOOR
UNIT 61
THE WENTA BUSINESS CENTRE
1 ELECTRIC AVE
ENFIELD
LONDON
- Phone:
- 07840393890
- Email:
- INFO@IGNITE-FOUNDATION.ORG
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window