MAKE LIFE KIND TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Make Life Kind educates young people on how to overcome social stigmas, such as Racism, Anti-Knife Crime, Self Esteem, Mental Health, Body Positivity, Gender Identity, Online Safety , Sports & Disability. The Charity achieves this by sending Expert Speakers with lived experience, into Schools, Youth Clubs, Colleges, Universities & Sports Clubs to educate & inspire young people to positive change.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 25 August 2023: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emma Louise Walsh | Chair | 02 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Pullman | Trustee | 02 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephan Horbaczewski | Trustee | 02 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £59.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07 JUL 2022
Charitable objects
2.1 THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE RESTRICTED SPECIFICALLY, ONLY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL (AND PARTICULARLY AMONGST CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE) INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, LEARNING SKILLS TO REGULATE SOCIAL AND EMOTIONAL WELLBEING IN EDUCATION SETTINGS. 2.2 NOTHING IN THESE ARTICLES SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH ANY STATUTORY PROVISION REGARDING THE MEANING OF THE WORD "CHARITABLE" OR THE WORDS "CHARITABLE PURPOSES" IN FORCE IN ANY PART OF THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
MAKE LIFE KIND
THE PLAZA
100 OLD HALL STREET
LIVERPOOL
L3 9QJ
- Phone:
- 01515190800
- Email:
- emma.walsh@aspion.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window