IVEGILL VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 520374
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

PROVIDES COMMUNITY BUILDING(VILLAGE HALL)

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £4,156
Total expenditure: £3,789

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Cumbria

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 November 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MR A W BLAKE Chair
None on record
BERNADETTE STAMPER Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.09k £1.22k £1.60k £4.01k £4.16k
Total expenditure £3.71k £2.68k £1.96k £3.54k £3.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 08 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 07 May 2024 97 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 06 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
A W Blake Ltd
Unit 1
Swathwaite Head
Ivegill
Carlisle
CA4 0PA
Phone:
01697473707
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available