DELFINA FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main objective is the support of cross-cultural dialogue, collaboration and exchange between artists, curators and cultural practitioners in the UK and around the world. The two major areas of activity are: artist residencies and public programme events, including talks, exhibitions, performances, screenings, and collaborative projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 25 April 2023: CIO registration
- 14 May 2024: Funds received from 1118409 THE DELFINA FOUNDATION
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Irene Panagopoulos | Trustee | 30 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
MARK MULLER | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES WANSBROUGH | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 25 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE (1) TO FOSTER, PROMOTE, ADVANCE, MAINTAIN AND IMPROVE PUBLIC EDUCATION AND TO PROMOTE INTEREST IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE VISUAL ARTS AND THE PERFORMING ARTS, AND (2) TO BENEFIT SUCH ONE OR MORE CHARITABLE PURPOSES, WHICH ARE COMPLEMENTARY TO THE ABOVE PURPOSES, OR CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES IN SUCH MANNER AND IN SUCH PROPORTIONS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Delfina Foundation
29-31 Catherine Place
LONDON
SW1E 6DY
- Phone:
- 02072335344
- Email:
- info@delfinafoundation.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window