UNDERSKIDDAW VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 520376
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Around 8 social events held each year for parishioners and their friends. Several education classes including music, art & history. Hall can be hired for a range of activities including parish council meetings, art exhibitions, private parties. The main aims of these activities are to maintain and develop this historic building as a focal point for all members of the community.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £52,750
Total expenditure: £35,057

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Cumbria

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 January 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • MILLBECK VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Robert Hayes Chair 21 March 2015
None on record
Stephen Richard Simpson Trustee 05 February 2025
None on record
Sylvia Jane Darigala Trustee 13 October 2023
FRIENDS OF THE MARY HEWETSON HOSPITAL, KESWICK
Received: On time
Dr Sreenivas Darigala Trustee 12 June 2023
None on record
Dr Eugene Patrick Lambert Trustee 14 October 2021
FRIENDS OF THE MARY HEWETSON HOSPITAL, KESWICK
Received: On time
Ellen barker Trustee 16 April 2019
SKIDDAW HOUSE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Stephen Phillip Holliday Trustee 16 April 2019
None on record
June Jude Trustee 16 April 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £8.15k £12.02k £21.00k £8.39k £52.75k
Total expenditure £6.86k £2.76k £5.09k £6.77k £35.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £18.64k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 25 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 25 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 29 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 18 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 11 February 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Ellen Barker
4 Millbeck Cottages
Millbeck
Keswick
Cumbria
CA12 4PT
Phone:
07491 958 371
Website:

No information available