BARAKAH CHARITY UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are providing first aide to people in need through emergency aid, in crisis areas to actively preserve life and limb with principal food, water, medication & clothes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Albania
- Algeria
- Bangladesh
- Benin
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Egypt
- Ethiopia
- Greece
- India
- Indonesia
- Jordan
- Kenya
- Kosovo
- Lebanon
- Libya
- Macedonia
- Madagascar
- Malawi
- Malaysia
- Mali
- Mauritania
- Morocco
- Northern Ireland
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
- Pakistan
- Philippines
- Scotland
- Somalia
- South Africa
- Spain
- Sri Lanka
- Sudan
- Togo
- Tunisia
- Turkey
- Uganda
- Yemen
Governance
- 05 December 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mohamad Ahmad Ajami Ajami | Chair | 05 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sabrina Abdo | Trustee | 05 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Eeman L Ghoul | Trustee | 05 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Muatasim Bouhouch | Trustee | 05 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lahoussine Ait Etaleb | Trustee | 05 December 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 December 2024 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 December 2024 | 48 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 05 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, OR SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC DISADVANTAGE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY COORDINATING AND DEVELOPING SERVICES SUCH AS, THE PROVISION OF BEDDING, CLOTHING, FOOD, FINANCE, CLEAN WATER AND SUCH OTHER SERVICES FOR THOSE IN NEED AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Bordesley Centre
Stratford Road
Sparkhill
BIRMINGHAM
B11 1AR
- Phone:
- 0121 724 0402
- Email:
- info@barakah.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window