WESTNEWTON PUBLIC HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
holds craft fairs, dances, dominoes, table top sales , hires out rooms for parish council meetings, youth club etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Cumbria
Governance
- 16 August 1963: Standard registration
- PUBLIC HALL (Previous name)
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARTHA WALKER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Janet Strong | Trustee | 27 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
SHIELA SZANDURSKI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MAUREEN WILLIAMSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.71k | £1.24k | £11.56k | £1.99k | £2.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.85k | £2.32k | £2.23k | £1.77k | £2.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £10.36k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22ND SEPTEMBER 1950
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
PARISH OF WESTNEWTON AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 BROOKLYN
WESTNEWTON
WIGTON
CA7 3NU
- Phone:
- 01697321073
- Email:
- strongjanet1@gmail.com
- Website:
-
aaaaaaaaaaaaaaaaaa.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window