EMERGENCY DAMAGE SUPPORT SERVICES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides help, advice and assistance to members of the public after fire, flood or other disaster.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 21 October 2022: CIO registration
- 20 March 2024: Funds received from 1129357 EMERGENCY DAMAGE MANAGEMENT
- EDM (Working name)
- EMERGENCY DAMAGE MANAGEMENT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adrian Reginald Durow | Chair | 21 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
James South | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rowan March Chuck | Trustee | 21 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 21 OCT 2022 AMENDED ON 28 FEB 2023
Charitable objects
(1) THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN IRELAND WHO ARE AFFECTED OR AT RISK OF BEING AFFECTED BY FIRE, FLOOD, STORM, IMPACT, EXPLOSION AND/OR SUCH OTHER INCIDENTS INVOLVING RISK OR DAMAGE TO HEALTH, LIFE OR PROPERTY IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME CONSIDER APPROPRIATE AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, BY THE PROVISION, OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF:- (A) ADVICE AND GUIDANCE WITH THE AIM OF ALLEVIATING DISTRESS, ANXIETY AND UNCERTAINTY; (B) FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE FOR THE PURPOSES OF PURCHASING ESSENTIAL ITEMS INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, GROCERIES, CLOTHING AND HOUSEHOLD ITEMS; AND (C) CAPABILITY AND RESOURCE FOR THE PURPOSES OF SECURING A RESIDENCE FOLLOWING AN INCIDENT WHEN REQUESTED BY THE FIRE AND RESCUE SERVICE, OTHER EMERGENCY SERVICES AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS INVOLVED IN THE PROVISION, OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION, OF RESCUE AND RELIEF SERVICES; AND (2) TO SUPPORT SUCH OTHER CHARITIES OR CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES SHALL CONSIDER APPROPRIATE WITH PARTICULAR REGARD TO RELIEF OF THE VICTIMS OF DISASTERS INCLUDING FIRE, FLOODING, STORM, IMPACT, EXPLOSION AND/OR SUCH OTHER INCIDENTS INVOLVING RISK OR DAMAGE TO HEALTH, LIFE OR PROPERTY OR OTHER PERSONS WHO HAVE SUFFERED IN ANY WAY AS A RESULT OF DISASTER INCLUDING FAMILIES OF DISASTER VICTIMS;
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ashmole & Co
1 St. Johns Court
Swansea Enterprise Park
SWANSEA
SA6 8QQ
- Phone:
- 03332021019
- Email:
- enquiries@edss.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window